U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Welcome
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Transcript]
  • May 01, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing ]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 01, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Information - Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.