U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00725
  • Case Name: Bordelon et al v. Jefferson Parish Sheriff's Office et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order]
  • May 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 08, 2025: [Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)]
April, 2025
  • April 26, 2025: [Notice of Compliance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.