U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00764
  • Case Name: Jackson v. Louisiana-I Gaming, a Louisiana Partnership in Commendam et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
  • May 13, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • May 13, 2025: [Order]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • May 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Compliance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Case Assignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.