U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10771
  • Case Name: Timothy Joseph Harris
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [zDocument - Required Information Needed When Filing a Chapter 13]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Payment Advices]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Confirmation Hearing Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Liquidation Analysis]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule J]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule I]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule H]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule G]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule E/F]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule D]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule C]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule A/B]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Fixed Fee Employment Agreement Disclosure (Attorney-Client) B.R. 2016(b)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (PF)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Extend Time to File Schedules (Order)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [02Extend Time to File Schedules]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Tax Documents - Private]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Requirements under 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db (PF)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.