U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00293-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Collins et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • May 01, 2025: [Minute Entry]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Motions Transferred]
  • April 30, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 18, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.