U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10439
  • Case Name: Tabatha R. Gilbert
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Pay Wages]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule J]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule I]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule H]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule G]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule E/F]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule D]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule C]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Schedule A/B]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Appearance and Request Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Smith, Daryl J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.