U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00519
  • Case Name: Hillman et al v. Viking Transport L L C et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 30, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 23, 2025: [Removal Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.