U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10786
  • Case Name: Wayne J. Bergeron and Suzanne D. Bergeron
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Deficiency Satisfied]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Response of No Objection]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [01Relief from Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Confirmation Hearing Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [zDocument (PF)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certification of Filing of Tax Returns]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Payment Advices: Certification in re: No Payment Advices]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Liquidation Analysis]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db (PF)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Jt Db]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.