U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80236
  • Case Name: Michael Ray Monroe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Confirmation Hearing Not Set - Plan Not Filed]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hastings, (AEX) E. Eugene [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.