U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00525
  • Case Name: White et al v. Lincare Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Response to Removal Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • May 06, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 25, 2025: [Removal Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 22, 2025: [State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.