U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00779
  • Case Name: Williams et al v. Venture Global Plaquemines, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 07, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • May 02, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 24, 2025: [Statement of Corporate Disclosure]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Compliance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Case Assignment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.