U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00510
  • Case Name: Cage et al v. Sutterfield et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Issued - All (Form Included)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 24, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 23, 2025: [Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 22, 2025: [Corrective Document]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Corrective Action]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 22, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.