U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10792
  • Case Name: Latasha N. Harrison
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brouphy, Greta M [Certificate of Service]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brouphy, Greta M [Deficiency Satisfied]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brouphy, Greta M [Extend Time to File Schedules (Order)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brouphy, Greta M [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brouphy, Greta M [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brouphy, Greta M [02Extend Time to File Schedules]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brouphy, Greta M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brouphy, Greta M [Notice of Requirements under 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brouphy, Greta M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brouphy, Greta M [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brouphy, Greta M [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brouphy, Greta M [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db (PF)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Brouphy, Greta M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.