U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10164
  • Case Name: Robert Henzel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Close Bankruptcy Case (Auto Closing)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Discharging Debtor (Auto) (Chapter 7 No Asset) (Order)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Tax Documents - Private]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Certification About a Financial Management Course Db (PF)]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Babin, Wilbur J. (Bill) [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.