U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80238
  • Case Name: Tori P. Johnston
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Appearance and Request Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficient Filing(s)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Notice of Deficiency/Required Documents]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income 122A-1 and Exemption of Presumption of Abuse 122A-1Supp]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficient Filing(s)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments for Chapter 7,12 or 13]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [First Meeting of Creditors and Discharge Issuance Set - Chapter 7]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Notice of Required Filings Chapter 7]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Set Deadlines on New Bankruptcy Case Chapter 7/13 Filed ECF]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments for Chapter 7, 12 or 13]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Willson, Thomas R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.