U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10798
  • Case Name: Toshica C. Smith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Confirmation Hearing Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Liquidation Analysis]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule J]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule I]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch) (any reason)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Requirements under 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Appraisal in re Chapter 13 Plan Cram Down or Lien Strip]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Appraisal of Real Estate]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Tax Documents - Private]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Acknowledgment of Receipt of Documents by Debtor(s)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certification of Filing of Tax Returns]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db (PF)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.