U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10796
  • Case Name: Pamela Johnson Bennett
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch) (any reason)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Order)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Deficiency - Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Requirements under 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Receipt of Installment Payment (First)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.