U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10331
  • Case Name: Kaitlyn Deanna Kidd
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficiency]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Delinquent Filing Fee Installment - form]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Required Filings]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Receipt (OTC auto)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Receipt (OTC auto)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Case Assigned]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Case Assigned]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Required Filings Chapter 13]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Required Filings Chapter 13]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.