U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50339
  • Case Name: Kenya Nicole Brown
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Wage Deduction]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Wage Deduction]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Hearing Notice Served. (Definite Hearing)]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule J]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule I]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule H]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule G]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule E/F]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule D]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule C]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Schedule A/B]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Employee Income Records]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Confirmation Hearing Not Set - Plan Not Filed]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.