U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10335
  • Case Name: Lakeisha D, Weatherspoon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Require Payroll Deduction]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Trustee's Motion to Require Payroll Deduction]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Domestic Support Information]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Payment Advices]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice to Individual Consumer Debtor under Section 342(b) of the Bankruptcy Code]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [none]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.