U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10334
  • Case Name: Michelle Alicia Patterson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Extend Time]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Extend Time]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [none]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [none]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.