U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50345
  • Case Name: Marieli Villalbazo Barber
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Appearance and Request Notice]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Wage Deduction]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Wage Deduction]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Appearance and Request Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Confirmation Hearing Set - Chapter 13 (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Change of Address Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Set Deadlines on New Bankruptcy Case Chapter 7/13 Filed ECF]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.