U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-13253
  • Case Name: Kevin M. Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Change of Address Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Luster, John W. [Corrective Entry]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hodge, John S. [Change of Address Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hodge, John S. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hodge, John S. [Judge Reassignment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hodge, John S. [Reopen Chapter 7 Case (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.