U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10810
  • Case Name: Judith Lilly
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Confirmation Hearing Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Payment Advices]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Appraisal of Real Estate]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certification of Filing of Tax Returns]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Liquidation Analysis]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (PF)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Fixed Fee Employment Agreement Disclosure (Attorney-Client) B.R. 2016(b)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule J]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule I]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule H]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule G]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule E/F]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule D]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule C]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Schedule A/B]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Requirements under 11 U.S.C. Section 521(a)(1)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Tax Documents - Private]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db (PF)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.