U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10342
  • Case Name: Dewayne Lee Sims
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Hearing Set (Other)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Payment Advices]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [none]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [(auto) Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Schedules A/B-J]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Crawford, Annette C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.