U.S. Federal Court Records for the Middle District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10345
  • Case Name: Timothy Oneal Cochran
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Certificate of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Financial Management Course]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [none]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 No Asset]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Copy of Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Local Form 2)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Abide, Samera L. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.