U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-10817
  • Case Name: Toby White, III
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Withhold Earnings and Pay to Trustee (Order)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Withhold Earnings and Pay to Trustee with Certificate of Service (Exparte Motion) (Sec A)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Appraisal of Real Estate]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Appraisal in re Chapter 13 Plan Cram Down or Lien Strip]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Liquidation Analysis]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Payment Advices]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Tax Documents - Private]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Acknowledgment of Receipt of Documents by Debtor(s)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certification of Filing of Tax Returns]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling Db (PF)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Notice of Deficiency - Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Fee Reminder - Petition]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Confirmation Hearing Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Social Security Statement - Private]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Beaulieu, S. J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.