U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-80253
  • Case Name: Richard B. Tiser, II
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [Notice of Deficiency/Required Documents]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 12]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 12]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [Employ]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [Set Deadlines on New Bankruptcy Case Chapter 11/12 Filed ECF]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [Order to Chapter 12 DIP Regarding Procedural Requirements]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [Employ]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [Autodocket US Treasury Receipt]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Johns, (Ch 12 Trustee) Todd S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.