U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Louisiana

louisiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50356
  • Case Name: Joseph Eric Solomon, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - First Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Appearance and Request Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee Payment - Bankruptcy Case (New)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Confirmation Hearing Not Set - Plan Not Filed]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [First Meeting of Creditors Set - Chapter 13 (Batch) (Cases filed 12/1/17 and after)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Information Regarding Prior Filings]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Deficient Filing(s)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Notice of Required Filings Chapter 13]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Copy of Social Security Card - Photo ID]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Declaration Re Electronic Filing - Statement of SSN (Rule 1007)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Rodriguez, Keith A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Fee)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.