open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

MASSACHUSETTS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Massachusetts
    Case Number:19-12761
    Party Name:Shannon Yerardi
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order Discharging Trustee/Closing Case]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order to Have Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Signature Page]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Signature Page]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mab.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?494724
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =