open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

MASSACHUSETTS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Massachusetts
    Case Number:19-30961
    Party Name:Kristal L. Theriault
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Order Discharging Trustee/Closing Case]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Order Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:April 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
    Date Published:January 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Request for Notice(s) (creditor event only)]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Signature Page]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mab.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?497166
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =