open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

MASSACHUSETTS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Massachusetts
    Case Number:19-14193
    Party Name:Brenda Osborne
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order Discharging Trustee/Closing Case]
    Date Published:April 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:March 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order on Motion To Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Order to Update]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Signature Page]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Madoff, David B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mab.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?497168
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =