U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mc-91635
  • Case Name: Board of Trustees, Sheet Metal Workers National Pension Fund v. Leading Way Construction Co., Inc.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice Cancelling Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order]
  • May 06, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Service of Process]
  • April 07, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Proposed Documents Submitted to the Court]
  • April 01, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Trustee Process]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Notice of Case Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.