U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-10061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Toulotte
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order For Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 17, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 17, 2022: [Procedural Order re Sentencing Hearing]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • May 23, 2022: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • March 17, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.