U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mc-94014
  • Case Name: Walsh v. The Roof Kings, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Brief - not related to a motion]
  • January 19, 2023: [Attorney Fees]
  • January 19, 2023: [Status Report]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • December 14, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Status Report]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Mail Returned]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [USMS Process Receipt and Return]
  • June 28, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 24, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • June 22, 2022: [Return Receipt]
  • June 13, 2022: [Return Receipt]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Canceling Deadline]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Copy Mailed]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.