U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-10279-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zhang et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 23, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 19, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Sever]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Travel]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • March 28, 2025: [Proposed Order submitted]
  • March 28, 2025: [USCA Judgment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Sever]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2025
  • February 01, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • December 13, 2022: [Status Report by Magistrate Judge]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Release from Custody]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 28, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • October 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 21, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order Of Detention]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing for Initial Appearance]
  • October 19, 2022: [Arrest]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Case Assignment]
  • October 13, 2022: [Indictment - Sealed]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Arrest - Other District]
  • October 13, 2022: [Arrest]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 13, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.