U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-10299-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thomas Cataloni, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • May 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 12, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice Canceling Hearing or Other Deadline]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 23, 2025: [Amend]
  • April 22, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order On Excludable Delay]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Rescheduling]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arrest]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 09, 2022: [Arrest]
  • November 09, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.