U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-30423
  • Case Name: Luis M. Matos
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Signature Page]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Order to Update]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ostrander, David W. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.