U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11639
  • Case Name: Carol A. LaRochelle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [MDOR/IRS Withdrawal of Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order to Update]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Signature Page]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.