U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11641
  • Case Name: Endoceutics Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Certificate of Service]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Certificate of Service]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Status Report]
  • January 16, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Notice]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Response]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Order To Set Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Certificate of Service]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Order on Generic Motion]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Order on Motion For Joint Administration]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Notice of Fee Due (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Joint Administration]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Affidavit]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Chapter 15 List]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Miscellaneous Motion]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 15 [Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.