U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11646
  • Case Name: Robert Eckert
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 10, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Signature Page]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Intent]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Schedules (Original)]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Chapter 7 Means Test Calculation 122A-2]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Extend Time]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Extend Time]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Order to Update]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 11, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lassman, Donald [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.