U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11652
  • Case Name: Kelly A. King
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Objection to Claim]
  • December 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Amended Motion/Application]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amended Motion/Application]
  • December 19, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Redact]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amended Document]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amend]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Evidence of Current and Sufficient Liability and Property Insurance]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Schedules (Original)]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Time]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Order to Update]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Bankowski-13-12, Carolyn [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.