U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40811
  • Case Name: Edward Joseph Shea, Jr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Amend]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order to Have Filing Fee Waived]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Order to Update]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Signature Page]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Baldiga, Joseph H. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.