U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-30424
  • Case Name: Ralph T. Cotter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order to Update]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • November 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.