U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40815
  • Case Name: Paul A Melo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order from BAP re: Appeal]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [** Not Used ** Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Extend Time]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Extend Time]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Appellant Designation]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Statement of Issues]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Initial Transmittal to (BAP)/District Court]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Notice to BAP]
  • December 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order on Motion For Relief From Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • December 05, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Objection]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Order on Motion for Emergency/Expedited Determination]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Emergency/Expedited Determination]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived (fka IFP)]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Marsh, Janice G [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.