U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-30426
  • Case Name: OMS Hospitality, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Extend Time]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order To Set Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Employ]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Notice]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Continue/Cancel Hearing]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Objection]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Amended Document]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order on Motion To Set/Combine Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Set/Combine Hearing/Status Conference]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Objection]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Extend Time]
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Relief from Stay/Co-Debtor Stay]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order to Update]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [For Order/Authority]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Certificate of Vote]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Signature Page]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Weiner, Gary M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.