U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11661
  • Case Name: Arete Rehabilitation, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Notice]
  • January 23, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Supplemental Document]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Compromise]
  • January 06, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • January 03, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Supplemental Document]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Supplemental Document]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Certificate of Service]
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Supplemental Document]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Order on Motion for Order/Authority]
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Supplemental Document]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Certificate of Service]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Order on Motion for Emergency/Expedited Determination]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Emergency/Expedited Determination]
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [For Order/Authority]
  • December 20, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Order on Application to Employ]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Order on Motion to Pay]
  • December 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Certificate of Service]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Affidavit]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Supplemental Document]
  • December 14, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Appoint Ombudsman]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Order (Generic)]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral]
  • December 13, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Pay]
  • December 12, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Cash Collateral]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Notice]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • December 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Supplemental Document]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Equity Security Holders]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Schedules (Original)]
  • December 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Statement]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Extend Time]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Employ]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 28, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • November 25, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Supplemental Document]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Order To Set Hearing]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Order to Update]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: LaMontagne, James [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
  • November 15, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.