U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-40817
  • Case Name: Karen Ann McCauley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mawhinney-Ch13, David A. [Notice]
  • December 01, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order Dismissing Case(Sua Sponte)]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 18, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice of Unfiled Prepetition Tax Returns]
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Notice to ProSe Debtors]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order on Motion To Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Order to Update]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pappalardo, Denise M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.