U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11666
  • Case Name: James A. Steeves
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Amend]
  • December 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Amended/Supplemental Schedules-Creditor Matrix]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Financial Management Course Certificate for AutoDocket Only]
  • November 21, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.