U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 22-11665
  • Case Name: Maritza Newman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Exhibit]
  • October 01, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Exhibit]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Approve]
  • September 30, 2024: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Settlement Agreement]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Financial Management Course]
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • January 09, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Court's Order of Deficiency]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Amend]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • December 07, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Verified Declaration of Schedules/Creditor Matrix]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Intent]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Schedules (Original)]
  • November 16, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DeGiacomo, Mark G. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.